Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit – Individuals Working in STEM Fields – Student Loan Payments
Sponsored by
Senators Kramer, Feldman, Hayes, and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a credit against the State income tax for certain individuals with outstanding student loan debt during the taxable year if the debt was incurred to attend an institution of higher education, an associate, bachelor's, graduate, or postgraduate degree was obtained, and the individual is employed full-time by a Maryland-based employer in a certain field; authorizing certain individuals, on or before December 1 each year, to apply for the credit; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax Credit – Individuals Working in STEM Fields – Student Loan Payments
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-751 )
Last Updated: 2/24/2020 4:14 PM