Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Senior and Vulnerable Adult Asset Recovery Unit
Sponsored by
Senators Kramer, Carter, Feldman, Hayes, Klausmeier, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Senior and Vulnerable Adult Asset Recovery Unit in the Office of the Attorney General for the purpose of protecting seniors and vulnerable adults from financial crimes under § 8-801 of the Criminal Law Article; authorizing the Unit to bring civil actions for damages against certain persons; requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2022, to appropriate at least $250,000 for the Unit; requiring the Unit to use the funds to hire new staff and investigate and assist the Unit in bringing civil actions; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {268274/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary Appropriations
Proceedings
42A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/07/2020
Legislative Date
5/07/2020
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Senior and Vulnerable Adult Asset Recovery Unit
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Favorable with Amendments {268274/1 Adopted 39
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Text - Third - Office of the Attorney General - Senior and Vulnerable Adult Asset Recovery Unit
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Judiciary Appropriations 42A
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51A
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/07/2020 5/07/2020 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-204, 14-4201 through 14-4204 )
(   8-801 )
Last Updated: 10/13/2020 4:36 PM