Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Single-Occupancy Public Restrooms - Availability (The Accessible to All Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan, Carter, Elfreth, Guzzone, Hayes, Hester, Kelley, Lee, Washington, West, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a single-occupancy public restroom be marked with certain gender-inclusive signage in certain places of public accommodation and certain public buildings; authorizing certain places of public accommodation to use certain gender-inclusive signage that was in use before October 1, 2020; providing that a county or municipality is responsible for enforcing the signage requirement in place of public accommodation; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1147
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Single-Occupancy Public Restrooms - Availability (The Accessible to All Act)
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-301, 20-307 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:03 PM