Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Felony Murder - Limitation and Review of Convictions for Children
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering provisions of law relating to murder in the first degree; providing that a person who was a child at the time of the offense may not be found to have committed murder in the first degree under certain provisions of law; authorizing a persons convicted, on or before September 30, 2021, of first degree murder who was a child at the time of the offense to file a motion for review of conviction; requiring a court to hold a certain hearing on the filing of a motion for review of conviction under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0385
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1338 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Felony Murder - Limitation and Review of Convictions for Children
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing canceled
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/11/2021 10:06 AM
Click to return on the top page