Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Horse Racing - Purse Dedication Account - Annual Grant to Fair Hill
Sponsored by
Senator Gallion
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from $100,000 to $1,300,000 the amount of a certain annual grant paid by the State Racing Commission to Fair Hill from the Purse Dedication Account.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Horse Racing - Purse Dedication Account - Annual Grant to Fair Hill
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2021
Legislative Date
1/28/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Horse Racing - Purse Dedication Account - Annual Grant to Fair Hill
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/28/2021 1/28/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/9/2021 6:46 PM
Click to return on the top page