Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture – Neonicotinoid Pesticides – Sale and Storage
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Restricting a person that sells a neonicotinoid pesticide under certain provisions of law to selling a neonicotinoid pesticide only to a certain certified applicator or farmer; and requiring a person selling a neonicotinoid pesticide to store each neonicotinoid pesticide behind the counter and in a manner that is inaccessible to customers.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0208
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0198 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Agriculture – Neonicotinoid Pesticides – Sale and Storage
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {534332/1 Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Agriculture – Neonicotinoid Pesticides – Sale and Storage
Senate 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments {534332/1 Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/26/2021 1:52 PM
Click to return on the top page