Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture – Multiflora Rose Management – Repeal
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Agriculture)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law declaring that the existence of multiflora rose may be a certain nuisance on land used for agricultural production; repealing provisions of law requiring a person who owns land where multiflora rose is grown to maintain the land in a certain manner; repealing provisions of law requiring the Secretary of Agriculture to make a certain investigation under certain circumstances; repealing provisions of law requiring the Secretary to provide certain notice of a certain violation; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/28/2020
Legislative Date
9/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Agriculture – Multiflora Rose Management – Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2021
Legislative Date
1/05/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/05/2021
Legislative Date
1/05/2021
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Agriculture – Multiflora Rose Management – Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/13/2021
Legislative Date
4/13/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Agriculture – Multiflora Rose Management – Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/28/2020 9/28/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Text - First - Agriculture – Multiflora Rose Management – Repeal
Senate 1/05/2021 1/05/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/05/2021 1/05/2021 Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Favorable Adopted 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Second Reading Passed 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Agriculture – Multiflora Rose Management – Repeal
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 6 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Referred Environment and Transportation 7 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Returned Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/13/2021 4/13/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Text - Chapter - Agriculture – Multiflora Rose Management – Repeal
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:26 PM
Click to return on the top page