Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Ethics - Officials and Lobbyists - Reporting of Ceremonial Gifts and Awards of Insignificant Monetary Value
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that an official need not disclose the acceptance of a ceremonial gift or award of insignificant monetary value on a financial disclosure statement; and providing that a regulated lobbyist need not allocate and report by name the individual recipients of ceremonial gifts and awards of insignificant monetary value on a lobbying activities report.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0190
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Ethics - Officials and Lobbyists - Reporting of Ceremonial Gifts and Awards of Insignificant Monetary Value
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-601, 5-607, 5-705 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:01 PM