Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal
Sponsored by
Senator Bailey
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a riparian property owner or lessee shall have the right of first refusal to apply for and, if approved, obtain a water column lease, or an aquaculture lease for use in the water column in an Aquaculture Enterprise Zone, applicable to a certain area that fronts the riparian property, subject to certain standards and requirements; requiring a person other than the riparian owner who applies for a certain lease in an area subject to a right of first refusal to provide a certain notice of the lease application; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0210
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-11A-05, 4-11A-08, 4-11A-10 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:01 PM