Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing
Sponsored by
Senators West and Lam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definitions of "community association" and "local code violation" for purposes of certain provisions of law authorizing community associations to seek judicial relief for nuisance abatement in Baltimore County; and repealing a provision of law requiring a certain court to determine in what amount and under what conditions a bond must be filed by a community association in a certain nuisance action.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/24/2020 1:46 PM