Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans (Pets for Vets Act of 2021)
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an animal control facility operated by a county or municipality to waive the adoption fee for a dog or cat for a veteran who presents a valid driver's license or identification card that includes a notation of veteran status; authorizing an animal control facility to limit the number of adoption fee waivers granted to an individual under the Act to one dog and one cat within a 6-month period; and applying the Act to all counties and municipalities.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0563
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0128 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/13/2020
Legislative Date
8/13/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/13/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/13/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/13/2020 8/13/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans (Pets for Vets Act of 2021)
Senate 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 2:30 p.m.
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/19/2021 2/13/2021 Favorable Adopted 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2021 2/13/2021 Second Reading Passed 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans (Pets for Vets Act of 2021)
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Referred Environment and Transportation 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/25/2021 1:42 PM
Click to return on the top page