Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Carter, Lee, Patterson, Smith, Sydnor, Washington, West, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Modifying the circumstances under which a police officer is required to charge by citation for certain misdemeanor or local ordinance violations that have an imprisonment penalty of up to 90 days; modifying the categories of offenses for which a police officer is authorized to charge by citation to include possession of a controlled dangerous substance other than marijuana; and modifying the circumstances under which a police officer may charge a defendant by citation.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0261
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0341 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:00 PM