Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Defenses - Fireman's Rule
Sponsored by
Senators Waldstreicher, Carter, Hough, Ready, Sydnor, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Eliminating, as a defense, the common law doctrine known as the fireman's rule, which prevents a safety officer from recovering damages for injuries the officer sustained under certain circumstances, or any similar rule that denies a safety officer recovery in an action at law or authorized by statute based on certain circumstances; and establishing that the Act does not affect certain other defenses, privileges, immunities, or rights.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Civil Actions - Defenses - Fireman's Rule
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Civil Actions - Defenses - Fireman's Rule
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:00 PM