Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Financial Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults (Maryland SAFE Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a cause of action for certain financial exploitation of certain vulnerable adults; authorizing a vulnerable adult or certain individuals in certain representative capacities to bring an action under the Act under certain circumstances; providing that an action authorized under the Act is in addition to and cumulative with certain other claims, causes of action, and remedies and shall survive the death of the vulnerable adult; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Civil Actions - Financial Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults (Maryland SAFE Act)
(   13-601 through 13-608 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2021 5:02 PM
Click to return on the top page