Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Veterans - Behavioral Health Services - Mental Health First Aid
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Carozza, Carter, Klausmeier, Patterson, Rosapepe, Salling, Young, Kelley, Feldman, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Hayes, Hershey, Jennings, Kramer, and Reilly
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the behavioral health services for which the Maryland Department of Health provides service coordination for veterans under certain provisions of law include mental health first aid; requiring that mental health first aid consist of training for veterans and the immediate family members of veterans on how to identify and respond to signs of mental illness and substance use disorders; requiring entities teaching a mental health first aid course to report certain information to the Department; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Veterans - Behavioral Health Services - Mental Health First Aid
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {897172/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Veterans - Behavioral Health Services - Mental Health First Aid
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Veterans - Behavioral Health Services - Mental Health First Aid
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {897172/1 Adopted 23
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23
Text - Third - Veterans - Behavioral Health Services - Mental Health First Aid
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 25
House 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 26
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-2702, 13-2703 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:00 PM