Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public High Schools – Health Education – Gambling Dangers and Addiction
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education, by July 1, 2020, to develop a certain program of education on the dangers of gambling and gambling addiction to be provided in public high schools; requiring the program to be coordinated with other State agencies responsible for gambling addiction education; authorizing a county board of education, beginning in the 2021-2022 school year, to require each public high school in the county to include instruction on the dangers of gambling one time for students in grades 9 through 12; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Health Education - Gambling Dangers and Addiction
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {324730/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-2)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Schools - Health Education - Gambling Dangers and Addiction
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Favorable with Amendments {324730/1 Adopted 31
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - Public High Schools – Health Education – Gambling Dangers and Addiction
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-2) 33
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Referred Ways and Means 34
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   7-446 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:00 PM