Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency
Sponsored by
Senators Hester and Elfreth
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the purpose of a certain clean energy loan program to include loans for water efficiency projects, environmental remediation projects intended to remove environmental or health hazards, and resiliency projects to increase the capacity of a property to withstand the effects of climate change; adding water efficiency projects, environmental remediation, resiliency projects, and grid resiliency projects to the list of items that require eligibility requirements under a certain ordinance; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0517
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/30/2020
Legislative Date
9/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {904532/1
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/10 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {904532/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/30/2020 9/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments {904532/1 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Motion Special Order until 2/10 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments {904532/1 Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Clean Energy Loan Program - Remediation and Resiliency
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Referred Environment and Transportation 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/23/2021 12:03 PM
Click to return on the top page