Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan and West
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a pilot program to examine the testing of oral fluid samples by certain police officers to assist in determining whether an individual is operating a motor vehicle while impaired by a controlled dangerous substance; authorizing a police officer in a participating jurisdiction who has reasonable grounds to believe that an individual is or has been driving or attempting to drive a motor vehicle while impaired by a controlled dangerous substance to request the individual to provide an oral fluid sample; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0808
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {798175/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-3)
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
52A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot Program
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments {798175/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Text - Third - Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot Program
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (42-3) 53A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Referred Judiciary 52A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-205.2, 16-205.3 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:59 PM