Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 188
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "certifying provider" to include physician assistants who have an active unrestricted license to practice, have an active delegation agreement with a primary supervising physician who is a certifying provider, and are in good standing with the State Board of Physicians; and altering the membership of the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0378
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0018 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {197274/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {973227/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (10-34)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted (133-1)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 188
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable with Amendments {197274/1 Adopted 38
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Jennings) Adopted 38
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Floor Amendment {973227/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (10-34) 38
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Text - Third - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 39
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 41
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48A
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted (133-1) 48A
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 48A
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Returned Passed 50
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 188
Text - Chapter - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:31 PM