Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Joint Committee on Workforce Development
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) and Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Joint Committee on Workforce Development to evaluate the condition of the State's public and private sector workforces, monitor skills shortages, identify strategies to expand employment opportunities, increase earnings, and evaluate the effectiveness of certain programs and policies; requiring the Committee to submit its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31 each year; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0840
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0616 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Joint Committee on Workforce Development
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) and Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) and Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Text - First - Joint Committee on Workforce Development
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) and Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) and Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-10A-16 )
Last Updated: 2/24/2020 1:34 PM