Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Pharmacy – Pharmacy Closure – Notice to Customers (The Dennis Robin Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an owner of a pharmacy to provide certain notice of the closing of the pharmacy at least 30 days prior to the anticipated closing of the pharmacy; requiring the notice to indicate the date of the anticipated closing, the name of the pharmacy to which customer prescriptions and records will transferred, and that a customer may request that their prescriptions and records be sent to another pharmacy; and requiring the State Board of Pharmacy to adopt certain regulations.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/25/2020
Legislative Date
9/25/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {364830/1 Adopted
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/25/2020 9/25/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Board of Pharmacy – Pharmacy Closure – Notice to Customers (The Dennis Robin Act)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments {364830/1 Adopted 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Pharmacy – Pharmacy Closure – Notice to Customers (The Dennis Robin Act)
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 9 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/25/2021 10:00 AM
Click to return on the top page