Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Chesapeake Bay Watershed States - Expenses and Contracts (Quit Polluting My Bay Act of 2021)
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Standard State Travel Regulations to prohibit the reimbursement for travel expenses to a certain state for which the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency has identified two or more pollution source sectors at a backstop actions level of oversight; prohibiting a public body from awarding a certain procurement contract to a business from a state for which the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency has identified two or more pollution source sectors at a backstop actions level of oversight under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0414 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/29/2020
Legislative Date
10/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/29/2020 10/29/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - State Finance and Procurement - Chesapeake Bay Watershed States - Expenses and Contracts (Quit Polluting My Bay Act of 2021)
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Last Updated: 2/11/2021 5:08 PM
Click to return on the top page