Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Protection of Information - Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act)
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Gallion, Hershey, Jennings, Kagan, Lam, Ready, Salling, Serafini, and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain units of State government to comply with certain standards and guidelines to ensure that the security of all information systems and applications is managed through a certain framework; requiring certain units of State government to undertake activities comprising collection, processing, and sharing of personally identifiable information in good faith; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0340
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Government - Protection of Information - Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act)
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-1301 through 10-1304, 10-1305 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:57 PM