Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clean Energy Jobs - Workforce Development - Scope
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 410
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the scope of apprenticeship and training programs that may receive certain support through the Clean Energy Workforce Account from the Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund for clean energy industry development; providing that $750,000 from the Fund be designated for the recruitment of individuals, including veterans and formerly incarcerated individuals, to the pre-apprenticeship jobs training programs and the registered apprenticeship jobs training programs beginning in fiscal year 2021; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1029
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Clean Energy Jobs - Workforce Development - Scope
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {767977/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Clean Energy Jobs - Workforce Development - Scope
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-3)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 410
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Clean Energy Jobs - Workforce Development - Scope
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Clean Energy Jobs - Workforce Development - Scope
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {767977/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Clean Energy Jobs - Workforce Development - Scope
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Economic Matters 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (129-3) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 410
Text - Chapter - Clean Energy Jobs - Workforce Development - Scope
(   9-20B-01, 9-20B-05 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:55 PM
Click to return on the top page