Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Carozza, Klausmeier, Patterson, Peters, Rosapepe, Serafini, Washington, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness; specifying the membership of the Commission; requiring the Commission to study and review issues related to the State's revenue structure and to make recommendations designed to promote economic development and a business-friendly environment, ensure fairness in the revenue structure, and maintain existing services; requiring the Commission to submit a final report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2021; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0185
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0073 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:55 PM