Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims and Witnesses - Restrictions on Release of Personal Information
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 539
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a certain person may withhold the address or telephone number of a certain victim, victim's representative, or witness before a certain trial or adjudicatory hearing to apply to felonies or domestically related crimes or delinquent acts instead of only felonies or crimes that would be a felony if committed by an adult.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0076
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {508877/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-2)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 539
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Victims and Witnesses - Restrictions on Release of Personal Information
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {508877/1 Adopted 25
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Victims and Witnesses - Restrictions on Release of Personal Information
Senate 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (43-2) 27
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Judiciary 28
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51A
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 539
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Victims and Witnesses - Restrictions on Release of Personal Information
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:19 PM