Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Unruly Social Gatherings - Civil Penalties
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person responsible for any premises from conducting, causing, permitting, or aiding an unruly social gathering; authorizing certain law enforcement officers to issue a citation for certain violations of the Act; specifying who may be issued a citation for certain violations; excluding a certain type of party or gathering from the prohibitions in the Act; providing certain circumstances constituting a certain defense; requiring that a citation include certain information; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0654
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Unruly Social Gatherings - Civil Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Unruly Social Gatherings - Civil Penalties
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-801 through 10-805 )
Last Updated: 2/21/2020 10:57 AM