Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Prices Listed on Dealer Websites
Sponsored by
Senators Hough, Ready, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch may not prohibit a dealer from listing on the dealer's website a vehicle for sale or lease at the purchase price, coerce or require a dealer to list a price different from the purchase price on the dealer's website, or take an adverse action against a dealer for listing a vehicle at a particular price on the dealer's website; and defining "purchase price" as the full delivered price of a vehicle, excluding taxes, title fees, and certain other dealer charges.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0178 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/16/2020
Legislative Date
9/16/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 1/29 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-5)
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/16/2020 9/16/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Prices Listed on Dealer Websites
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Favorable 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Motion Special Order until 1/29 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 5 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Favorable Adopted 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Second Reading Passed 6 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Prices Listed on Dealer Websites
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Third Reading Passed (42-5) 7 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Referred Economic Matters 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 12:55 PM
Click to return on the top page