Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services
Sponsored by
Senators Washington, Carter, Hayes, Kagan, Lam, Lee, McCray, Ready, Smith, Sydnor, West, Young, Benson, Carozza, Ellis, Hester, Patterson, and Pinsky
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 109
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a certain unaccompanied minor in need of shelter to consent to shelter and supportive services under certain circumstances; authorizing an unaccompanied minor who is a parent to consent to shelter and supportive services for the minor's child; requiring a certain service provider to contact a parent, a guardian, or an adult relative of an unaccompanied minor within 72 hours; requiring a service provider to develop procedures to screen staff members who work with minors including a criminal history check; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0206
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {714631/1
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Washington) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {714631/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
42A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 109
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Favorable with Amendments {714631/1 40
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Washington) Adopted 40
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Favorable with Amendments {714631/1 Adopted 40
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 42
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Appropriations 42A
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 109
Text - Chapter - Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-2701 through 4-2708 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:54 PM