Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Regulations
Sponsored by
Senator Beidle
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the Maryland Department of Health to adopt regulations establishing standards governing memory care and Alzheimer's disease units in assisted living programs, including the number of hours and content of training to be completed yearly by certain staff, a direct care staff standard adequate to meet the needs of residents, and requiring compliance by assisted living programs with the standards; defining "direct care staff" as an employee, a volunteer, or a contractual employee who provides certain services to residents; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0416
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/23/2020
Legislative Date
10/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {157779/1 Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Care Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Regulations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/23/2020 10/23/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Care Facilities – Assisted Living Programs – Memory Care and Alzheimer’s Disease Unit Regulations
Senate 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments {157779/1 Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Care Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Regulations
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/4/2021 1:53 PM
Click to return on the top page