Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration – Reduced Fare Program for Opioid Treatment Program Patients – Program Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the application of the Maryland Transit Administration's reduced fare program for opioid treatment program patients by prohibiting participation by a treatment program that was subject to a license suspension or revocation, approval of a settlement agreement establishing specific conditions for continued program operations, or an approved petition for receivership within the previous 10 years.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/24/2020
Legislative Date
10/24/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {507071/1 Adopted
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/13/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/24/2020 10/24/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration – Reduced Fare Program for Opioid Treatment Program Patients – Program Requirements
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {507071/1 Adopted 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Transit Administration – Reduced Fare Program for Opioid Treatment Program Patients – Program Requirements
Senate 2/19/2021 2/13/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 14 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Referred Environment and Transportation 14 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:53 PM
Click to return on the top page