Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Condominiums - Responsibility for Property Insurance Deductibles
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 57
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that the council of unit owners' property insurance deductible is a common expense if the cause of any damage to the condominium originates from an event outside the condominium units and common elements; increasing, from $5,000 to $10,000, the maximum amount of the council of unit owners' property insurance deductible for which a unit owner is responsible; applying the Act to all policies of property and casualty insurance issued, delivered, or renewed in the State to a condominium council of unit owners; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0108
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Condominiums - Responsibility for Property Insurance Deductibles
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/12 (Senator Beidle) Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Condominiums - Responsibility for Property Insurance Deductibles
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 57
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Condominiums - Responsibility for Property Insurance Deductibles
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable 25
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Condominiums - Responsibility for Property Insurance Deductibles
Senate 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/12 (Senator Beidle) Adopted 25
Senate 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 26
Senate 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 26
Text - Third - Condominiums - Responsibility for Property Insurance Deductibles
Senate 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 28
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 29
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 57
Text - Chapter - Condominiums - Responsibility for Property Insurance Deductibles
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/1/2020 2:36 PM