Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Equity Resource Act
Sponsored by
Senators Hayes, Beidle, Benson, Ellis, Feldman, Kramer, Lee, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, Washington, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health to designate certain areas as Health Equity Resource Communities in a certain manner; specifying that the purpose of establishing Health Equity Resource Communities is to reduce health disparities, improve health outcomes, improve access to primary care, promote primary and secondary prevention services, and reduce health care costs and hospital admissions and readmissions; authorizing certain credits against the State income tax for certain health care providers and organizations; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0463
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/24/2020
Legislative Date
9/24/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Health Equity Resource Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/24/2020 9/24/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Text - First - Maryland Health Equity Resource Act
Senate 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
(   20-1401 through 20-1408 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2021 1:26 PM
Click to return on the top page