Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 386
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Board of Dental Examiners to issue a cease and desist order for certain violations; increasing certain penalties for certain acts related to the unauthorized practice of dentistry or dental hygiene; altering from a misdemeanor to a felony penalties for violating certain provisions of law related to dental laboratory work or advertising a dental appliance by increasing the fine to up to $2,000 per day, instead of a one-time fine, or imprisonment of up to 2 years, rather than 6 months; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0947
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0365 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {714837/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-1)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
49BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 386
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Favorable with Amendments {714837/1 Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Third Reading Passed (42-1) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 49BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 386
Text - Chapter - Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders
(   4-321, 4-606 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:53 PM
Click to return on the top page