Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 229
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing certain controlled dangerous substance prescriptions to be dispensed on an electronic prescription; requiring, except under certain circumstances, a certain health practitioner to issue a prescription for a controlled dangerous substance using an electronic prescription; authorizing an authorized prescriber to issue a written or oral prescription for a controlled dangerous substance only under certain circumstances; authorizing the Secretary of Health to issue certain waivers; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2022
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {767970/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 229
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {767970/1 Adopted 43
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 45
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 46
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 49B
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 229
Text - Chapter - Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101, 5-501, 5-504, 5-701 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:53 PM