Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Applicability
Sponsored by
Senators Bailey and Beidle
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the Maryland Healthy Working Families Act does not apply to employees of a county board of education who are called to work on an as-needed basis, can reject or accept the shift offered by the county board of education, and are not guaranteed to be called on to work by the county board of education.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0909
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0241 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/30/2020
Legislative Date
7/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Applicability
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/30/2020 7/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Applicability
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/2/2021 5:44 AM
Click to return on the top page