Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Time Off for Employee Voting
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring every employer in the State to allow any employee, rather than any employee who claims to be a registered voter, in the State up to 2 hours absence from work to vote in an election, rather than only on election day; altering the requirement that certain employees furnish to their employers certain proof to specify that the proof be reasonable and furnished in a timely manner; and prohibiting an employer from discriminating, retaliating, or taking any form of reprisal against an employee who is absent from work to vote.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0398
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/15/2020
Legislative Date
10/15/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Time Off for Employee Voting
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/15/2020 10/15/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law - Time Off for Employee Voting
Senate 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Last Updated: 2/5/2021 3:30 PM
Click to return on the top page