Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
Sponsored by
Senators Augustine, Elfreth, Reilly, Rosapepe, Benson, and Klausmeier
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 49
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, except under certain circumstances, certain lenders to serve on the borrower at least 30 day before a lender repossesses a mobile home a written notice of the lender's intention to repossess a certain mobile home; providing that a mobile home retailer has a duty of good faith and fair dealing in providing financial information to a prospective consumer borrower; prohibiting a mobile home retailer from steering a prospective consumer borrower to certain financing products; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0093
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {857775/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 49
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {857775/1 Adopted 25
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Text - Third - Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
Senate 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 27
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Economic Matters 28
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 52
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 49
Text - Chapter - Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/1/2020 2:36 PM