Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Estate Recoveries - Presentation of Claims Against Medicaid Recipients
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the period of time within which the Maryland Department of Health must present a claim against the estate of a deceased Maryland Medical Assistance Program recipient before the claim is barred.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0393
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {218476/1
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Committee Amendment {218476/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Estate Recoveries - Presentation of Claims Against Medicaid Recipients
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {218476/1 20
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Committee Amendment {218476/1 Withdrawn 20
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Favorable Adopted 20
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Second Reading Passed 20
Text - Third - Estates and Trusts - Estate Recoveries - Presentation of Claims Against Medicaid Recipients
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 21
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Referred Judiciary 24
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/14/2020 12:11 PM