Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of Legislative Audits - Audits of the Baltimore Police Department
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 535
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of Legislative Audits to conduct a certain audit or audits of the Baltimore Police Department; specifying that the scope and objectives of a certain audit or audits shall be determined by the Legislative Auditor; requiring the Baltimore City government to make available to the Office of Legislative Audits all City employees, records, and information systems deemed necessary by the Legislative Auditor to conduct the required audit or audits; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Appropriations
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 535
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Office of Legislative Audits - Audits of the Baltimore Police Department
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 1/22 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Favorable Adopted 20
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Second Reading Passed 20
Text - Third - Office of Legislative Audits - Audits of the Baltimore Police Department
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 21
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Referred Appropriations 22
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49B
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 535
Text - Chapter - Office of Legislative Audits - Audits of the Baltimore Police Department
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1220, 2-1223 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:51 PM