Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection – Electronic Transactions – Sale and Lease of Vehicles
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 72
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that only a dealer may contract for the sale and delivery of a vehicle by electronic means under certain circumstances; providing that a consumer shall be deemed not to have agreed to enter into a transaction for the sale or lease of a vehicle with a dealer by electronic means unless the dealer provides the consumer with certain documents and a reasonable opportunity to review the documents before providing an electronic signature; requiring that a vehicle be delivered at a certain location and within a certain time period; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0139
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Electronic Transactions - Sale of Vehicles
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {677577/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {653891/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 72
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Electronic Transactions - Sale of Vehicles
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {677577/1 Adopted 25
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Text - Third - Consumer Protection – Electronic Transactions – Sale and Lease of Vehicles
Senate 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 27
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Economic Matters 28
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {653891/1 Adopted 51
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 52
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Consumer Protection – Electronic Transactions – Sale and Lease of Vehicles
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 72
Text - Chapter - Consumer Protection – Electronic Transactions – Sale and Lease of Vehicles
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/1/2020 2:36 PM