Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - Use of Criminal History in Admission - Modifications
Sponsored by
Senators Patterson and Augustine
Status
In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an institution of higher education from using certain third-party admissions application information about the criminal background of the applicant to deny admission; altering a certain process in using certain information about an applicant's criminal history to make a determination regarding the applicant's access to campus residency; and authoritzing an institution of higher education to develop a process for determining or restricitng access to campus residency for certain students convicted of certain crimes.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/13/2020
Legislative Date
10/13/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2021
Legislative Date
1/06/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2021
Legislative Date
1/25/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/14/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {244033/1
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/14/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {244033/1 Adopted
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {153223/1 (Senator Hough)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/26 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {153223/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-13)
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 10/13/2020 10/13/2020 Pre-filed
Text - First - Institutions of Higher Education - Use of Criminal History in Admission - Modifications
Senate 1/06/2021 1/06/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 1/25/2021 1/25/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/23/2021 2/14/2021 Favorable with Amendments {244033/1 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2021 2/14/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Favorable with Amendments {244033/1 Adopted 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Floor Amendment {153223/1 (Senator Hough) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Motion Special Order until 2/26 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Floor Amendment {153223/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Institutions of Higher Education - Use of Criminal History in Admission - Modifications
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (33-13) 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Appropriations 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/4/2021 3:15 PM
Click to return on the top page