Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Opportunity Zone Incentives - Alteration of the More Jobs for Marylanders and Opportunity Zone Enhancement Programs
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain terms relating to eligibility for benefits under the More Jobs for Marylanders and Opportunity Zone Enhancement programs; altering, to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018, but before January 1, 2022, the time for which enhancements under the Opportunity Zone Enhancement Program are applicable; limiting eligibility for certain Opportunity Zone Enhancement Program benefits to investments in biotechnology and cybersecurity companies established in opportunity zones by March 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0045
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2019
Legislative Date
11/01/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2020
Legislative Date
1/06/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2019 11/01/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Economic Development - Opportunity Zone Incentives - Alteration of the More Jobs for Marylanders and Opportunity Zone Enhancement Programs
Senate 1/06/2020 1/06/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/19/2020 1:55 PM