Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Annual and Personal Property Reports - Submission
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Assessments and Taxation)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 529
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the reference to a certain report that certain entities are required to file each year with the State Department of Assessments and Taxation from a report on personal property to an annual report; altering the reference to a certain report the Department may require certain entities to file to the report on personal property; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/16/2019
Legislative Date
9/16/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/19/2019
Legislative Date
12/19/2019
Action
Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Annual and Personal Property Reports - Submission
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
3 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2020
Legislative Date
1/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
3 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Annual and Personal Property Reports - Submission
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
5 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
6 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 529
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Annual and Personal Property Reports - Submission
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/16/2019 9/16/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 12/19/2019 12/19/2019 Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Annual and Personal Property Reports - Submission
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 3 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/10/2020 1/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 3 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Annual and Personal Property Reports - Submission
Senate 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 5 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Referred Ways and Means 6 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 529
Text - Chapter - Annual and Personal Property Reports - Submission
(   11-101, 11-102 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:50 PM
Click to return on the top page