Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that certain employees working at a heightened security interest location be paid a certain wage or combination of wages and benefits; declaring findings of the General Assembly; specifying that certain provisions of the Act do not diminish certain collective bargaining rights of certain covered employees; specifying that a certain agreement to work for less than a certain wage is void under certain circumstances; requiring an employer to keep certain records for at least 3 years; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0685
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0062 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/28/2020
Legislative Date
10/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 10/28/2020 10/28/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Last Updated: 1/31/2021 6:46 PM
Click to return on the top page