Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Payment of Fees
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a mortgagor or a grantor who secures a mortgage or deed of trust for the purchase of a single family dwelling unit that is subject to fees imposed by a common ownership community to pay the fees as part of the payments made under the mortgage or deed of trust; requiring a mortgagor or grantor to notify the mortgagee or grantee and the governing body of the common ownership community of the decision to pay the common ownership community fees to the mortgagee or grantee; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2019
Legislative Date
10/30/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Payment of Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2019 10/30/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Payment of Fees
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing 1/16 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:50 PM