Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Facilities - Certificate of Need - Exception for State-Owned Facilities
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "health care facility" to exempt State-owned facilities from the requirement that a health care facility have a certificate of need issued by the Maryland Health Care Commission.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/24/2019
Legislative Date
9/24/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/19/2019
Legislative Date
12/19/2019
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/24/2019 9/24/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/19/2019 12/19/2019 Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health Care Facilities - Certificate of Need - Exception for State-Owned Facilities
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 Unfavorable Report by Finance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:50 PM