Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Nonresident Insurance Producers - Cancellation
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 520
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the holder of a nonresident insurance producer license to maintain a current license as a resident insurance producer in good standing in the holder's home state; authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to cancel a nonresident producer license after receiving notification that the producer no longer has a home state license; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/16/2019
Legislative Date
9/16/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/19/2019
Legislative Date
12/19/2019
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Nonresident Insurance Producers - Cancellation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance - Nonresident Insurance Producers - Cancellation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
12
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
13
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 520
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Nonresident Insurance Producers - Cancellation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/16/2019 9/16/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/19/2019 12/19/2019 Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Insurance - Nonresident Insurance Producers - Cancellation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Favorable Adopted 10
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Second Reading Passed 10
Text - Third - Insurance - Nonresident Insurance Producers - Cancellation
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 12
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Referred Economic Matters 13
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 520
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Nonresident Insurance Producers - Cancellation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 1:50 PM