Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Elections - Certification of Voting Systems - Standards
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the standards for certification of a voting system by the State Board of Elections to include a requirement that the voting system accommodate multiple methods of voting, including ranked choice voting.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/26/2019
Legislative Date
9/26/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Elections - Certification of Voting Systems - Standards
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Re-referred Budget and Taxation (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/26/2019 9/26/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board of Elections - Certification of Voting Systems - Standards
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable 25
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Re-referred Budget and Taxation (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 25
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-102 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:49 PM