Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Emergency Management - Continuity Planning
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Military)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 516
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain principal departments of the Executive Branch to develop, annually update, and submit to the Maryland Emergency Management Agency (MEMA) continuity of operations plans to address the impact of a certain emergency or crisis; requiring certain continuity of operations plans to include certain information; requiring MEMA to develop certain guidelines and to serve as a coordinating agency; stating the intent of the General Assembly that MEMA implement certain provisions of law with existing personnel and resources; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/24/2019
Legislative Date
9/24/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Government - Emergency Management - Continuity Planning
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/02/2020
Legislative Date
1/02/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {174130/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Government - Emergency Management - Continuity Planning
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 516
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Government - Emergency Management - Continuity Planning
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/24/2019 9/24/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Government - Emergency Management - Continuity Planning
Senate 1/02/2020 1/02/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Favorable with Amendments {174130/1 Adopted 15
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15
Text - Third - State Government - Emergency Management - Continuity Planning
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 17
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 18
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49B
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 516
Text - Chapter - State Government - Emergency Management - Continuity Planning
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-116 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:49 PM